NY S08122 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10298A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10298A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends provisions of law relating to authorizing a pilot residential parking permit system in the city of Buffalo.
Title
Extends provisions of law relating to authorizing a pilot residential parking permit system in the city of Buffalo.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A10298A |
2018-06-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.2114 |
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-05-30 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8122A |
2018-05-30 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2018-04-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A10298 (Same As) 2018-07-31 - signed chap.157