NY S08077 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8530
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8530
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that every public utility shall provide the public service commission an affidavit annually, that no call centers or other facilities providing customer service have been closed without notice and hearing before the commission; makes related provisions.
Title
Provides that every public utility shall provide the public service commission an affidavit annually, that no call centers or other facilities providing customer service have been closed without notice and hearing before the commission; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-06 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A8530 |
2024-01-23 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.198 |
2024-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08530 (Same As) 2024-02-13 - signed chap.81