NY S08028 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-27 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-27 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the state to convey certain forest preserve land; such sale shall be subject to legislative approval and the proceeds of such conveyance shall be used for acquisitions to the forest preserve.
Title
Authorizes the state to convey certain forest preserve land; such sale shall be subject to legislative approval and the proceeds of such conveyance shall be used for acquisitions to the forest preserve.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-27 | Assembly | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2016-06-22 | Assembly | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2016-06-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-09 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 8028A |
2016-06-08 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1596 |
2016-06-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |