NY S08025 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-07 - SIGNED CHAP.66
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-07 - SIGNED CHAP.66
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits residential and commercial properties from erecting or installing digital billboards or signs that use flashing, intermittent or moving lights near certain Mitchell-Lama housing within a city with a population of one million or more; relates to the effectiveness thereof.
Title
Prohibits residential and commercial properties from erecting or installing digital billboards or signs that use flashing, intermittent or moving lights near certain Mitchell-Lama housing within a city with a population of one million or more; relates to the effectiveness thereof.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-07 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.66 |
2024-02-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2024-01-30 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-30 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-01-23 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.250 |
2024-01-23 | Assembly | substituted for a8539 |
2024-01-09 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2024-01-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-01-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-01-08 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.28 |
2024-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08539 (Same As) 2024-01-23 - substituted by s8025