NY A08539 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-23 - substituted by s8025
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits residential and commercial properties from erecting or installing digital billboards or signs that use flashing, intermittent or moving lights near certain Mitchell-Lama housing within a city with a population of one million or more; relates to the effectiveness thereof.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits residential and commercial properties from erecting or installing digital billboards or signs that use flashing, intermittent or moving lights near certain Mitchell-Lama housing within a city with a population of one million or more; relates to the effectiveness thereof.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-01-17 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-23Assemblysubstituted by s8025
2024-01-18Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.250
2024-01-17Assemblyreported
2024-01-08Assemblyreferred to transportation

Same As/Similar To

S08025 (Same As) 2024-02-07 - SIGNED CHAP.66

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback