NY S08020 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-11 - PRINT NUMBER 8020A
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-11 - PRINT NUMBER 8020A
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to creating a distinctive disaster relief and emergency preparedness license plate and the "disaster relief and emergency preparedness fund".
Title
Relates to creating a distinctive disaster relief and emergency preparedness license plate and the "disaster relief and emergency preparedness fund".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-22 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8020A |
2018-06-11 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2018-05-22 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2018-03-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A10694 (Same As) 2018-05-31 - print number 10694a