NY S07983 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8641B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8641B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of social services and not-for-profit corporations to inquire into whether applicants for financial assistance have engaged in military service.
Title
Requires the department of social services and not-for-profit corporations to inquire into whether applicants for financial assistance have engaged in military service.
Sponsors
Sen. Tony Avella [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-17 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A8641B |
2016-06-14 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 7983B |
2016-06-14 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2016-06-14 | Senate | returned to senate |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | referred to social services |
2016-06-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-09 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 7983A |
2016-06-07 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1520 |
2016-06-07 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-06-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES |
Same As/Similar To
A08641 (Same As) 2016-11-04 - signed chap.407