NY A08641 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-5)
Status: Passed on November 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-04 - signed chap.407
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-5)
Status: Passed on November 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-04 - signed chap.407
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of social services and not-for-profit corporations to inquire into whether applicants for financial assistance have engaged in military service.
Title
Requires the department of social services and not-for-profit corporations to inquire into whether applicants for financial assistance have engaged in military service.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-04 | Senate | signed chap.407 |
2016-10-26 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2016-06-17 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-17 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1520 |
2016-06-17 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7983B |
2016-06-17 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-06-17 | Senate | returned to senate |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | repassed assembly |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | amended on third reading (t) 8641b |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-14 | Senate | recalled from senate |
2016-06-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.61 |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | rules report cal.61 |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-05-26 | Assembly | print number 8641a |
2016-05-26 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to veterans' affairs |
2016-01-07 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S07983 (Same As) 2016-06-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8641B