NY S07974 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-05 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8970A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-05 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8970A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Renames the Christopher Street-Sheridan Square subway station on the IRT Broadway-Seventh Avenue line the "Christopher Street-Stonewall National Monument station"; provides for the repeal of such provisions upon the expiration thereof.
Title
Renames the Christopher Street-Sheridan Square subway station on the IRT Broadway-Seventh Avenue line the "Christopher Street-Stonewall National Monument station"; provides for the repeal of such provisions upon the expiration thereof.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-05 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A8970A |
2024-05-28 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1493 |
2024-05-28 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2024-02-29 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7974A |
2024-02-29 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2024-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A08970 (Same As) 2024-06-28 - signed chap.127