NY S07967 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-09 - SIGNED CHAP.325
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-09 - SIGNED CHAP.325
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the transmission of forward-facing employment data in labor market information.
Title
Requires the transmission of forward-facing employment data in labor market information.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-09 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.325 |
2016-08-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.426 |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | substituted for a10578 |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2016-06-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-01 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1281 |
2016-05-31 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A10578 (Same As) 2016-06-16 - substituted by s7967