NY S07900 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-15 - PRINT NUMBER 7900C
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-15 - PRINT NUMBER 7900C
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to regulation of sports betting and mobile sports wagering; implements a tax equivalent to eight and one-half percent of sports wagering gross revenue; requires reporting; provides for civil penalties for violations.
Title
Relates to regulation of sports betting and mobile sports wagering; implements a tax equivalent to eight and one-half percent of sports wagering gross revenue; requires reporting; provides for civil penalties for violations.
Sponsors
Sen. John Bonacic [R] | Sen. Joseph Addabbo [D] | Sen. John Brooks [D] | Sen. Rich Funke [R] |
Sen. Martin Golden [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Senate Racing, Gaming and Wagering Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Senate Racing, Gaming and Wagering Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-15 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7900C |
2018-06-15 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2018-06-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7900B |
2018-06-11 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2018-06-05 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-05-21 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7900A |
2018-05-21 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2018-03-13 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2018-03-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |
Same As/Similar To
A11144 (Same As) 2018-06-18 - print number 11144a