NY S07899 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-18 - referred to labor
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-18 - referred to labor
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "New York state YouthBuild act"; sets program requirements; authorizes grants to eligible YouthBuild participants; establishes application requirements.
Title
Enacts the "New York state YouthBuild act"; sets program requirements; authorizes grants to eligible YouthBuild participants; establishes application requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-18 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2022-05-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-16 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-05-10 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1223 |
2022-05-04 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2022-01-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A03343 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to labor