NY S07886 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the duration of orders of protection in child abuse and neglect proceedings and in permanency planning hearings in family court; extends to two years and for certain cases to five years.
Title
Relates to the duration of orders of protection in child abuse and neglect proceedings and in permanency planning hearings in family court; extends to two years and for certain cases to five years.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-06-13 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 7886A |
2018-03-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-03-21 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.693 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |