NY S07880 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-23 - SIGNED CHAP.286
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-23 - SIGNED CHAP.286
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the incineration of aqueous film-forming foam containing perfluoroalkyl and polyfluoroalkyl substances in certain cities.
Title
Prohibits the incineration of aqueous film-forming foam containing perfluoroalkyl and polyfluoroalkyl substances in certain cities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-23 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.286 |
2020-11-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.105 |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | substituted for a9952b |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2020-06-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-06-08 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.719 |
2020-06-06 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7880B |
2020-06-06 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2020-05-21 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7880A |
2020-05-21 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2020-02-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A09952 (Same As) 2020-11-23 - SIGNED CHAP.286