NY A09952 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-2)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - substituted by s7880b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits the incineration of aqueous film-forming foam containing perfluoroalkyl and polyfluoroalkyl substances in certain cities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits the incineration of aqueous film-forming foam containing perfluoroalkyl and polyfluoroalkyl substances in certain cities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-09Assemblysubstituted by s7880b
2020-06-09Assemblyrules report cal.105
2020-06-09Assemblyreported
2020-06-09Assemblyreported referred to rules
2020-06-06Assemblyreference changed to ways and means
2020-06-06Assemblyprint number 9952b
2020-06-06Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to environmental conservation
2020-05-22Assemblyprint number 9952a
2020-05-22Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to environmental conservation
2020-02-28Assemblyreferred to environmental conservation

Same As/Similar To

S07880 (Same As) 2020-06-09 - returned to senate

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A09952&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A09952&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A09952
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A09952&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A09952A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A09952&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A09952B
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A09952&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A09952&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1

Bill Comments

feedback