NY S07867 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on December 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-22 - APPROVAL MEMO.51
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on December 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-22 - APPROVAL MEMO.51
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the division of criminal justice services in consultation with the department of health, office of victim services, division of state police, and the New York State Coalition Against Sexual Abuse to develop and implement a statewide electronic tracking system for evidence collection kits used to collect and preserve evidence of a sexual assault or other sex offense.
Title
Directs the division of criminal justice services in consultation with the department of health, office of victim services, division of state police, and the New York State Coalition Against Sexual Abuse to develop and implement a statewide electronic tracking system for evidence collection kits used to collect and preserve evidence of a sexual assault or other sex offense.
Sponsors
Sen. Alessandra Biaggi [D] | Sen. Cordell Cleare [D] | Sen. James Gaughran [D] | Sen. Andrew Gounardes [D] |
Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] | Sen. Zellnor Myrie [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-22 | Senate | APPROVAL MEMO.51 |
2022-12-22 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.730 |
2022-12-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.707 |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | substituted for a9596a |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2022-05-31 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-31 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-25 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1547 |
2022-05-17 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-11 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2022-03-29 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7867A |
2022-03-29 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2022-01-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A09596 (Same As) 2022-06-03 - substituted by s7867a