NY A09596 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-4)
Status: Introduced on March 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-03 - substituted by s7867a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-03 - substituted by s7867a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the division of criminal justice services in consultation with the department of health, office of victim services, division of state police, and the New York State Coalition Against Sexual Abuse to develop and implement a statewide electronic tracking system for evidence collection kits used to collect and preserve evidence of a sexual assault or other sex offense.
Title
Directs the division of criminal justice services in consultation with the department of health, office of victim services, division of state police, and the New York State Coalition Against Sexual Abuse to develop and implement a statewide electronic tracking system for evidence collection kits used to collect and preserve evidence of a sexual assault or other sex offense.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Assembly | substituted by s7867a |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | rules report cal.707 |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | reported |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2022-03-28 | Assembly | print number 9596a |
2022-03-28 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2022-03-18 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S07867 (Same As) 2022-12-22 - APPROVAL MEMO.51