NY S07859 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 18 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-15 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9512
Status: Introduced on May 18 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-15 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9512
Summary
Renames the Seek Program as the Percy Ellis Sutton SEEK Program.
Title
Renames the Seek Program as the Percy Ellis Sutton SEEK Program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-15 | SUBSTITUTED BY A9512 | |
2010-06-14 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | |
2010-06-10 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | |
2010-06-09 | 1ST REPORT CAL.905 | |
2010-05-18 | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A09512 (Same As) 2010-07-15 - signed chap.188
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S07859&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |