NY A09512 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-4)
Status: Passed on July 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-15 - signed chap.188
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-4)
Status: Passed on July 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-15 - signed chap.188
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to rename the SEEK Program the Percy Ellis Sutton SEEK Program.
Title
Renames the Seek Program as the Percy Ellis Sutton SEEK Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-15 | signed chap.188 | |
2010-07-08 | delivered to governor | |
2010-06-21 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-06-21 | PASSED SENATE | |
2010-06-15 | 3RD READING CAL.905 | |
2010-06-15 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7859 | |
2010-02-24 | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION | |
2010-02-24 | delivered to senate | |
2010-02-24 | passed assembly | |
2010-02-18 | advanced to third reading cal.673 | |
2010-02-09 | reported | |
2010-01-07 | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S07859 (Same As) 2010-06-15 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9512