NY S07852 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 17 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-14 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3514A
Status: Introduced on May 17 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-14 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3514A
Summary
Provides for furnishing of a copy of the transcript of the trial of a defendant convicted of a homicide offense, or of the proceedings which resulted in such conviction, to a family member of the victim at no cost to the victim or survivors; provides that the expense thereof shall be chargeable to the county, or in the counties within the city of New York, a city charge, as the case may be.
Title
Provides for furnishing of a copy of the transcript of the trial of a defendant convicted of a homicide offense, or of the proceedings which resulted in such conviction, to a family member of the victim at no cost to the victim or survivors; provides that the expense thereof shall be chargeable to the county, or in the counties within the city of New York, a city charge, as the case may be.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-14 | SUBSTITUTED BY A3514A | |
2010-06-10 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | |
2010-06-09 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | |
2010-06-08 | 1ST REPORT CAL.854 | |
2010-05-17 | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A03514 (Same As) 2010-08-16 - tabled
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S07852&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |