NY A03514 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Vetoed on August 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-16 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on August 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-16 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for furnishing of a copy of the transcript of the trial of a defendant convicted of a homicide offense, or of the proceedings which resulted in such conviction, to a family member of the victim at no cost to the victim or survivors; provides that the expense thereof shall be chargeable to the county, or in the counties within the city of New York, a city charge, as the case may be.
Title
Provides for furnishing of a copy of the transcript of the trial of a defendant convicted of a homicide offense, or of the proceedings which resulted in such conviction, to a family member of the victim at no cost to the victim or survivors; provides that the expense thereof shall be chargeable to the county, or in the counties within the city of New York, a city charge, as the case may be.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-16 | tabled | |
2010-08-13 | vetoed memo.6749 | |
2010-08-03 | delivered to governor | |
2010-06-15 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-06-15 | PASSED SENATE | |
2010-06-14 | 3RD READING CAL.854 | |
2010-06-14 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7852 | |
2010-02-23 | REFERRED TO CODES | |
2010-02-23 | delivered to senate | |
2010-02-23 | passed assembly | |
2010-01-06 | ordered to third reading cal.267 | |
2010-01-06 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-01-06 | DIED IN SENATE | |
2009-06-22 | REFERRED TO RULES | |
2009-06-22 | delivered to senate | |
2009-06-22 | passed assembly | |
2009-06-22 | ordered to third reading rules cal.528 | |
2009-06-22 | rules report cal.528 | |
2009-06-22 | reported | |
2009-06-22 | reported referred to rules | |
2009-06-18 | reported referred to ways and means | |
2009-06-16 | print number 3514a | |
2009-06-16 | amend (t) and recommit to codes | |
2009-04-20 | reported referred to codes | |
2009-01-27 | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S07852 (Same As) 2010-06-14 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3514A