NY S07845 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on October 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-08 - SIGNED CHAP.400
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on October 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-08 - SIGNED CHAP.400
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to terms and conditions of employment of certain nonjudicial officers and employees of the unified court system.
Title
Relates to terms and conditions of employment of certain nonjudicial officers and employees of the unified court system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-08 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.400 |
2014-09-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.515 |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a10098 |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2014-06-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-16 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1421 |
2014-06-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A10098 (Same As) 2014-06-19 - substituted by s7845