NY A10098 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-19 - substituted by s7845
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-19 - substituted by s7845
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to terms and conditions of employment of certain nonjudicial officers and employees of the unified court system.
Title
Relates to terms and conditions of employment of certain nonjudicial officers and employees of the unified court system.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-19 | Assembly | substituted by s7845 |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.515 |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-06-13 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S07845 (Same As) 2014-10-08 - SIGNED CHAP.400