NY S07791 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-02 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8694
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-02 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8694
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the due date for the required capital projects reports from January 1st to June 1st; defines preliminary project cost estimates; excludes the MTA from needs assessment requirements.
Title
Changes the due date for the required capital projects reports from January 1st to June 1st; defines preliminary project cost estimates; excludes the MTA from needs assessment requirements.
Sponsors
Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-02 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A8694 |
2022-01-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.159 |
2022-01-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08694 (Same As) 2022-02-24 - signed chap.22