NY S07744 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the duty of the office for the aging to provide certain information relating to services through electronic means including a mobile application.
Title
Relates to the duty of the office for the aging to provide certain information relating to services through electronic means including a mobile application.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-03-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-03-14 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.644 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGING |