NY S07699 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to medication assisted treatment for substance abuse disorders; prohibits prior authorization.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to medication assisted treatment for substance abuse disorders; prohibits prior authorization.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-10SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2020-03-04Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2020-03-03Senate1ST REPORT CAL.559
2020-02-25SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2020-02-10SenateREFERRED TO HEALTH

Same As/Similar To

A09634 (Same As) 2020-03-11 - reported referred to ways and means

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback