NY S07690 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the department of state to study, evaluate and make recommendations concerning safety standards at baseball stadiums to determine whether the protective netting currently in use at baseball stadiums is sufficient to protect spectators during baseball games.
Title
Directs the department of state to study, evaluate and make recommendations concerning safety standards at baseball stadiums to determine whether the protective netting currently in use at baseball stadiums is sufficient to protect spectators during baseball games.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-05-30 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 7690A |
2018-03-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-03-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.602 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A08893 (Same As) 2018-06-04 - reported referred to rules