NY A08893 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-04 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-04 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the department of state to study, evaluate and make recommendations concerning safety standards at baseball stadiums to determine whether the protective netting currently in use at baseball stadiums is sufficient to protect spectators during baseball games.
Title
Directs the department of state to study, evaluate and make recommendations concerning safety standards at baseball stadiums to determine whether the protective netting currently in use at baseball stadiums is sufficient to protect spectators during baseball games.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-04 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-05-04 | Assembly | print number 8893a |
2018-05-04 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to consumer affairs and protection |
2018-01-05 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
S07690 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES