NY S07680 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the county of Nassau assessor to accept an application for a real property tax exemption from Innovative Resources for Independence for a portion of the 2021 school taxes, all of the 2022-2023 school taxes and all of the 2022 general taxes.
Title
Authorizes the county of Nassau assessor to accept an application for a real property tax exemption from Innovative Resources for Independence for a portion of the 2021 school taxes, all of the 2022-2023 school taxes and all of the 2022 general taxes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-04-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-04-15 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.806 |
2024-03-18 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7680A |
2024-03-18 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2023-10-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08127 (Same As) 2024-03-18 - print number 8127a