NY A08127 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 13 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-06-07 - substituted by s7680a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the county of Nassau assessor to accept an application for a real property tax exemption from Innovative Resources for Independence for a portion of the 2021 school taxes, all of the 2022-2023 school taxes and all of the 2022 general taxes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the county of Nassau assessor to accept an application for a real property tax exemption from Innovative Resources for Independence for a portion of the 2021 school taxes, all of the 2022-2023 school taxes and all of the 2022 general taxes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-07Assemblysubstituted by s7680a
2024-06-07Assemblyrules report cal.615
2024-06-07Assemblyreported
2024-05-20Assemblyreported referred to rules
2024-05-14Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2024-03-18Assemblyprint number 8127a
2024-03-18Assemblyamend and recommit to real property taxation
2024-01-03Assemblyreferred to real property taxation
2023-10-13Assemblyreferred to real property taxation

Same As/Similar To

S07680 (Same As) 2024-09-27 - SIGNED CHAP.385

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/A8127
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08127&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08127
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08127&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08127A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08127&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08127&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08127&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3

Bill Comments

feedback