NY S07662 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 22-6)
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-09 - referred to insurance
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-09 - referred to insurance
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to insurance coverage for substance abuse disorder; requires health plans to use a health care provider who specializes in behavioral health or substance use disorder treatment to supervise and oversee the medical management decisions relating to substance abuse treatment.
Title
Relates to insurance coverage for substance abuse disorder; requires health plans to use a health care provider who specializes in behavioral health or substance use disorder treatment to supervise and oversee the medical management decisions relating to substance abuse treatment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-09 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2014-06-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-03 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1151 |
2014-06-03 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7662A |
2014-06-03 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2014-06-02 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-05-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A09943 (Same As) 2014-06-16 - print number 9943b