NY S07641 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-25 - referred to local governments
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-25 - referred to local governments
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows aquatic plant growth control districts to also control certain invasive species.
Title
Allows aquatic plant growth control districts to also control certain invasive species.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-25 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2022-05-25 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-25 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-05-03 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1043 |
2022-04-27 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - WITHDRAWN |
2022-04-20 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7641A |
2022-04-20 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2022-04-20 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2022-03-07 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A04974 (Same As) 2022-05-10 - held for consideration in local governments