NY S07591 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 29 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes retail licensees to purchase beer, wine and liquor by means of a business credit card.
Title
Authorizes retail licensees to purchase beer, wine and liquor by means of a business credit card.
Sponsors
Sen. Andrew Lanza [R] | Sen. Terrence Murphy [R] | Sen. Martin Dilan [D] | Sen. Martin Golden [R] |
Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-05-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1202 |
2018-01-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A09688 (Same As) 2018-02-02 - referred to economic development