NY S07586 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-21 - SIGNED CHAP.191
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to permitting Uniondale Land Trust to file an application for certain real property tax exemptions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to permitting Uniondale Land Trust to file an application for certain real property tax exemptions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-21AssemblySIGNED CHAP.191
2020-09-16SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2020-06-10Assemblyreturned to senate
2020-06-10Assemblypassed assembly
2020-06-10Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.130
2020-06-10Assemblysubstituted for a9606a
2020-06-09Assemblyreferred to real property taxation
2020-06-09SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2020-06-09SenatePASSED SENATE
2020-06-08SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.711
2020-06-08SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2020-06-03SenatePRINT NUMBER 7586A
2020-06-03SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
2020-01-28SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Same As/Similar To

A09606 (Same As) 2020-06-10 - substituted by s7586a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback