NY S07579 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for amendments to a tribal-state compact with the Seneca Nation of Indians.
Title
Provides for amendments to a tribal-state compact with the Seneca Nation of Indians.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-06 | Senate | RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-06-09 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2023-06-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-06-09 | Senate | MESSAGE OF NECESSITY - 3 DAY MESSAGE |
2023-06-08 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1837 |
2023-06-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A07771 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to ways and means