NY S07579 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-29 - SIGNED CHAP.129
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-29 - SIGNED CHAP.129
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the towns of Mina and French Creek in Chautauqua county to elect a single town justice to preside in the town courts of such towns.
Title
Authorizes the towns of Mina and French Creek in Chautauqua county to elect a single town justice to preside in the town courts of such towns.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-29 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.129 |
2020-07-29 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.99 |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | substituted for a9884 |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2020-06-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-06-08 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.710 |
2020-06-08 | Senate | AMENDED BY RESTORING TO PREVIOUS PRINT 7579 |
2020-06-08 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-04-24 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7579A |
2020-04-24 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2020-01-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A09884 (Same As) 2020-07-29 - SIGNED CHAP.129