NY S07547 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-06-07 - ordered to third reading rules cal.531
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-06-07 - ordered to third reading rules cal.531
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a petition in a summary proceeding to recover possession of real property in the city of Schenectady to allege proof of compliance with local laws requiring rental residential property registration and licensure.
Title
Requires a petition in a summary proceeding to recover possession of real property in the city of Schenectady to allege proof of compliance with local laws requiring rental residential property registration and licensure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction And Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction And Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-07 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.531 |
2024-06-07 | Assembly | substituted for a7656a |
2024-06-06 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2024-06-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-02-26 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 7547A |
2024-02-14 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-02-13 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-02-12 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.400 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2023-06-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A07656 (Same As) 2024-06-07 - substituted by s7547a