NY S07547 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9711
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9711
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends provisions of law relating to the sale of municipal notes and bonds of the county of Erie.
Title
Extends provisions of law relating to the sale of municipal notes and bonds of the county of Erie.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-30 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A9711 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-03-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.569 |
2018-01-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A09711 (Same As) 2018-07-01 - signed chap.83