NY S07536 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-31 - SIGNED CHAP.515
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes a state insurance advisory board promoting the development and growth of the insurance industry in the state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes a state insurance advisory board promoting the development and growth of the insurance industry in the state.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-12-31AssemblySIGNED CHAP.515
2016-12-31AssemblyAPPROVAL MEMO.31
2016-12-20SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2016-06-15Assemblyreturned to senate
2016-06-15Assemblypassed assembly
2016-06-14Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.97
2016-06-14Assemblysubstituted for a10267a
2016-06-09Assemblyreferred to insurance
2016-06-09SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2016-06-09SenatePASSED SENATE
2016-06-06SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 7536A
2016-05-23SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1013
2016-05-23SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2016-05-09SenateREFERRED TO INSURANCE

Same As/Similar To

A10267 (Same As) 2016-06-14 - substituted by s7536a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback