NY A10267 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on May 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-14 - substituted by s7536a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-14 - substituted by s7536a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a state insurance advisory board promoting the development and growth of the insurance industry in the state.
Title
Establishes a state insurance advisory board promoting the development and growth of the insurance industry in the state.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-14 | Assembly | substituted by s7536a |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.97 |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | rules report cal.97 |
2016-06-07 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | amend and recommit to rules 10267a |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-05-19 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S07536 (Same As) 2016-12-31 - SIGNED CHAP.515