NY S07532 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the removal and prohibition of directors, trustees, officers, members or partners of certain entities.
Title
Provides for the removal and prohibition of directors, trustees, officers, members or partners of certain entities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-04-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.783 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO BANKS |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-06-07 | Assembly | referred to banks |
2023-06-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-06-07 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1726 |
2023-06-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A07428 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.209