NY A07428 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.209
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.209
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the removal and prohibition of directors, trustees, officers, members or partners of certain entities.
Title
Provides for the removal and prohibition of directors, trustees, officers, members or partners of certain entities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Banks Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Banks Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.209 |
2023-06-07 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.662 |
2023-06-07 | Assembly | rules report cal.662 |
2023-06-07 | Assembly | reported |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | amend and recommit to rules 7428a |
2023-05-23 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-05-19 | Assembly | referred to banks |
Same As/Similar To
S07532 (Same As) 2024-04-15 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING