NY S07531 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8295
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8295
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits the Canastota central school district to establish an insurance reserve fund.
Title
Permits the Canastota central school district to establish an insurance reserve fund.
Sponsors
Sen. Rachel May [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A8295 |
2022-05-25 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1545 |
2022-05-25 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2021-11-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08295 (Same As) 2022-06-30 - signed chap.251