NY A08295 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - signed chap.251
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - signed chap.251
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits the Canastota central school district to establish an insurance reserve fund.
Title
Permits the Canastota central school district to establish an insurance reserve fund.
Sponsors
Asm. John Salka [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | Assembly | signed chap.251 |
2022-06-23 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-06-01 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-06-01 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1545 |
2022-06-01 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7531 |
2022-05-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.411 |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | rules report cal.411 |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to education |
2021-10-20 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S07531 (Same As) 2022-06-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8295