NY S07514 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-07 - SIGNED CHAP.238
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-07 - SIGNED CHAP.238
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Grants retroactive membership with tier II status in the New York state and local police and fire retirement system to Vincent Verret.
Title
Grants retroactive membership with tier II status in the New York state and local police and fire retirement system to Vincent Verret.
Sponsors
Sen. Hugh Farley [R] |
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-07 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.238 |
2014-08-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | home rule request |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.610 |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a9820a |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2014-06-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-18 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2014-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1496 |
2014-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-06-02 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7514A |
2014-06-02 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2014-05-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A09820 (Same As) 2014-06-19 - substituted by s7514a