NY A09820 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-19 - substituted by s7514a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-19 - substituted by s7514a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Grants retroactive membership with tier II status in the New York state and local police and fire retirement system to Vincent Verret.
Title
Grants retroactive membership with tier II status in the New York state and local police and fire retirement system to Vincent Verret.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-19 | Assembly | substituted by s7514a |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.610 |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2014-06-02 | Assembly | print number 9820a |
2014-06-02 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S07514 (Same As) 2014-08-07 - SIGNED CHAP.238