NY S07485 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-17 - APPROVAL MEMO.23
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to residency requirements for peace officers employed by Cornell University.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to residency requirements for peace officers employed by Cornell University.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-12-17AssemblyAPPROVAL MEMO.23
2012-12-17AssemblySIGNED CHAP.499
2012-12-05SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2012-06-18Assemblyreturned to senate
2012-06-18Assemblypassed assembly
2012-06-18Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.330
2012-06-18Assemblysubstituted for a10400a
2012-06-12Assemblyreferred to codes
2012-06-12SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-06-12SenatePASSED SENATE
2012-06-12SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1198
2012-06-12SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2012-06-07SenatePRINT NUMBER 7485A
2012-06-07SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
2012-05-25SenateREFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS

Same As/Similar To

A10400 (Same As) 2012-06-18 - substituted by s7485a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback