NY S07472 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-04 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5802A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the county of Nassau assessor to accept an application for a real property tax exemption from 786 Muhammadi Masjid, Inc. for certain school and general taxes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the county of Nassau assessor to accept an application for a real property tax exemption from 786 Muhammadi Masjid, Inc. for certain school and general taxes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-04SenateSUBSTITUTED BY A5802A
2024-06-04SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1704
2024-06-04SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2024-03-18SenatePRINT NUMBER 7472A
2024-03-18SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
2024-01-03SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
2023-05-30SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Same As/Similar To

A05802 (Same As) 2024-06-04 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback