NY A05802 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-10 - print number 5802a
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-10 - print number 5802a
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the county of Nassau assessor to accept an application for a real property tax exemption from 786 Muhammadi Masjid, Inc. for certain school and general taxes.
Title
Authorizes the county of Nassau assessor to accept an application for a real property tax exemption from 786 Muhammadi Masjid, Inc. for certain school and general taxes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-10 | Assembly | print number 5802a |
2024-01-10 | Assembly | amend and recommit to real property taxation |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2023-03-23 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S07472 (Same As) 2024-03-18 - PRINT NUMBER 7472A