NY S07454 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-17 - SIGNED CHAP.524
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Extends the period of time during which certain real property tax exemptions apply.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extends the period of time during which certain real property tax exemptions apply.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-07-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-09-17 SIGNED CHAP.524
2010-09-07 DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2010-07-01 returned to senate
2010-07-01 passed assembly
2010-07-01 ordered to third reading rules cal.537
2010-07-01 substituted for a10599
2010-06-03 referred to ways and means
2010-06-03 DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2010-06-03 PASSED SENATE
2010-05-24 ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2010-05-18 2ND REPORT CAL.
2010-05-17 1ST REPORT CAL.546
2010-04-12 REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT

Same As/Similar To

A10599 (Same As) 2010-07-01 - substituted by s7454

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback